LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB209
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB209
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB209
Compare Versions
SB209 Chaptered April 18, 2016
SB209 Enrolled April 4, 2016
SB209 Amended March 17, 2016
SB209 Amended September 4, 2015
SB209 Amended September 2, 2015
SB209 Amended August 17, 2015
SB209 Amended July 16, 2015
SB209 Amended July 7, 2015
SB209 Amended May 12, 2015
SB209 Amended March 19, 2015
SB209 Introduced February 11, 2015
Version 1 (Old)
SB209 Chaptered April 18, 2016
SB209 Enrolled April 4, 2016
SB209 Amended March 17, 2016
SB209 Amended September 4, 2015
SB209 Amended September 2, 2015
SB209 Amended August 17, 2015
SB209 Amended July 16, 2015
SB209 Amended July 7, 2015
SB209 Amended May 12, 2015
SB209 Amended March 19, 2015
SB209 Introduced February 11, 2015
Version 2 (New)
Compare