|
08/07/2015
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 141, Statutes of 2015.
|
|
|
|
08/07/2015
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/30/2015
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 10 a.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/16/2015
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 1981.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/09/2015
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/09/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 2328.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/06/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/02/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/01/2015
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 30).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/11/2015
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/04/2015
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 1296.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2015
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1149.) (May 28).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2015
|
Set for hearing May 28.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2015
|
May 11 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2015
|
Set for hearing May 11.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2015
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 594.) (April 14).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2015
|
Set for hearing April 14.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2015
|
April 7 hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2015
|
Set for hearing April 7.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2015
|
March 24 hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2015
|
Set for hearing March 24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/12/2015
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 14.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/11/2015
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|