California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB212 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 11, 2015

Enrolled

Bill July 27, 2015

Chaptered

Bill August 7, 2015

Amended

Bill July 2, 2015
Bill June 2, 2015
Bill April 28, 2015