California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB22 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 1, 2014

Amended

Bill February 29, 2016
Bill January 25, 2016
Bill June 4, 2015
Bill June 2, 2015
Bill May 5, 2015
Bill April 21, 2015