LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB22
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB22
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB22
Compare Versions
SB22 Amended February 29, 2016
SB22 Amended January 25, 2016
SB22 Amended June 4, 2015
SB22 Amended June 2, 2015
SB22 Amended May 5, 2015
SB22 Amended April 21, 2015
SB22 Introduced December 1, 2014
Version 1 (Old)
SB22 Amended February 29, 2016
SB22 Amended January 25, 2016
SB22 Amended June 4, 2015
SB22 Amended June 2, 2015
SB22 Amended May 5, 2015
SB22 Amended April 21, 2015
SB22 Introduced December 1, 2014
Version 2 (New)
Compare