|
10/11/2015
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 794, Statutes of 2015.
|
|
|
|
10/11/2015
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/08/2015
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/02/2015
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2423.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/01/2015
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/01/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 2720.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/28/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 27). Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/15/2015
|
July 15 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/09/2015
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/01/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 30). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/24/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on V.A. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 24). Re-referred to Com. on V.A.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/15/2015
|
Referred to Coms. on P.E., R., & S.S. and V.A.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/02/2015
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 1198.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1149.) (May 28). Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2015
|
Set for hearing May 28.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2015
|
May 11 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2015
|
Set for hearing May 11.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 797.) (April 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2015
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on P.E. & R.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2015
|
Set for hearing April 27.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on P.E. & R. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 596.) (April 14). Re-referred to Com. on P.E. & R.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2015
|
Set for hearing April 14.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/26/2015
|
Referred to Coms. on V.A. and P.E. & R.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2015
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 15.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/12/2015
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|