California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB221 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 12, 2015

Enrolled

Bill September 3, 2015

Chaptered

Bill October 11, 2015

Amended

Bill July 9, 2015
Bill April 20, 2015