|
09/09/2015
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 286, Statutes of 2015.
|
|
|
|
09/09/2015
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/28/2015
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:45 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/27/2015
|
In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/27/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 2636.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/20/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/19/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 19).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/14/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (July 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/30/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (June 29). Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/15/2015
|
Referred to Coms. on TRANS. and NAT. RES.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/04/2015
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/04/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 1323.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2015
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1149.) (May 28).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2015
|
Set for hearing May 28.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2015
|
May 18 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2015
|
Set for hearing May 18.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 825.) (April 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2015
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2015
|
Set for hearing April 28.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2015
|
April 21 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2015
|
Set for hearing April 21.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/26/2015
|
Referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2015
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 19.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2015
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|