LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB231
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB231
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB231
Compare Versions
SB231 Chaptered September 9, 2015
SB231 Enrolled August 27, 2015
SB231 Amended June 2, 2015
SB231 Amended April 20, 2015
SB231 Introduced February 13, 2015
Version 1 (Old)
SB231 Chaptered September 9, 2015
SB231 Enrolled August 27, 2015
SB231 Amended June 2, 2015
SB231 Amended April 20, 2015
SB231 Introduced February 13, 2015
Version 2 (New)
Compare