California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB235 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 17, 2015

Enrolled

Bill September 1, 2015

Chaptered

Bill October 5, 2015

Amended

Bill August 17, 2015
Bill July 15, 2015
Bill July 8, 2015
Bill May 5, 2015