LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB235
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB235
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB235
Compare Versions
SB235 Chaptered October 5, 2015
SB235 Enrolled September 1, 2015
SB235 Amended August 17, 2015
SB235 Amended July 15, 2015
SB235 Amended July 8, 2015
SB235 Amended May 5, 2015
SB235 Introduced February 17, 2015
Version 1 (Old)
SB235 Chaptered October 5, 2015
SB235 Enrolled September 1, 2015
SB235 Amended August 17, 2015
SB235 Amended July 15, 2015
SB235 Amended July 8, 2015
SB235 Amended May 5, 2015
SB235 Introduced February 17, 2015
Version 2 (New)
Compare