California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB239 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 17, 2015

Enrolled

Bill September 10, 2015

Chaptered

Bill October 10, 2015

Amended

Bill September 2, 2015
Bill August 31, 2015
Bill June 1, 2015
Bill April 23, 2015
Bill March 23, 2015