LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB239
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB239
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB239
Compare Versions
SB239 Chaptered October 10, 2015
SB239 Enrolled September 10, 2015
SB239 Amended September 2, 2015
SB239 Amended August 31, 2015
SB239 Amended June 1, 2015
SB239 Amended April 23, 2015
SB239 Amended March 23, 2015
SB239 Introduced February 17, 2015
Version 1 (Old)
SB239 Chaptered October 10, 2015
SB239 Enrolled September 10, 2015
SB239 Amended September 2, 2015
SB239 Amended August 31, 2015
SB239 Amended June 1, 2015
SB239 Amended April 23, 2015
SB239 Amended March 23, 2015
SB239 Introduced February 17, 2015
Version 2 (New)
Compare