|
08/10/2015
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 156, Statutes of 2015.
|
|
|
|
08/10/2015
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/30/2015
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 10 a.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/16/2015
|
In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/16/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 2432.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/09/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/08/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (July 8).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/30/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (June 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/14/2015
|
Referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/23/2015
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 746.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2015
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8, be amended, and ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2015
|
Set for hearing April 20.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 526.) (April 7). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2015
|
Set for hearing April 7.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/26/2015
|
Referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2015
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 20.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2015
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|