California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB241 Latest Draft

Bill / Chaptered Version Filed 08/10/2015

 BILL NUMBER: SB 241CHAPTERED BILL TEXT CHAPTER 156 FILED WITH SECRETARY OF STATE AUGUST 10, 2015 APPROVED BY GOVERNOR AUGUST 10, 2015 PASSED THE SENATE APRIL 23, 2015 PASSED THE ASSEMBLY JULY 16, 2015 AMENDED IN SENATE APRIL 21, 2015 INTRODUCED BY Senator Bates (Coauthors: Assembly Members Brough and Daly) FEBRUARY 17, 2015 An act to amend Sections 1965.3, 1965.6, and 1965.7 of the Streets and Highways Code, relating to neighborhood electric vehicles. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST SB 241, Bates. Neighborhood electric vehicles. Existing law, until January 1, 2017, authorizes the County of Orange to establish a neighborhood electric vehicle (NEV) transportation plan for the Ranch Plan Planned Community in that county. Under existing law, operation of a neighborhood electric vehicle in violation of certain provisions is an infraction. This bill would extend the operative period of these provisions until January 1, 2022. By extending the operative period of a crime, the bill would impose a state-mandated local program. Existing law requires NEV lanes to be classified, as specified, for the purposes of the NEV transportation plan for the Ranch Plan Planned Community. Existing law requires that a lane used by both NEVs and conventional vehicle traffic on a street with a speed limit of 25 miles per hour or less be classified as a Class III NEV route. This bill would, instead, require that a lane used by NEVs and conventional vehicle traffic on a street with a speed limit of 35 miles per hour or less be classified as a Class III NEV route. Existing law requires the county to provide a report to the Legislature, by November 1, 2015, if the county adopts a plan as authorized. This bill would, instead, require the county to provide that report by November 1, 2020. The California Constitution requires the state to reimburse local agencies and school districts for certain costs mandated by the state. Statutory provisions establish procedures for making that reimbursement. This bill would provide that no reimbursement is required by this act for a specified reason. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 1965.3 of the Streets and Highways Code is amended to read: 1965.3. The transportation plan shall include, but is not limited to, all of the following elements: (a) Route selection, which includes a finding that the route will accommodate NEVs without an adverse impact upon traffic safety, and will consider, among other things, the travel needs of commuters and other users. (b) Transportation interfacing, which shall include, but not be limited to, coordination with other modes of transportation so that a NEV driver may employ multiple modes of transportation in reaching a destination in the plan area. (c) Provision for NEV related facilities including, but not limited to, special access points and NEV crossings. (d) Provisions for parking facilities, including, but not limited to, community commercial centers, golf courses, public areas, parks, and other destination locations. (e) Provisions for special paving, road markings, signage and striping for NEV travel lanes, road crossings, parking, and circulation. (f) Provisions for NEV electrical charging stations. (g) NEV lanes for the purposes of the transportation plan shall be classified as follows: (1) Class I NEV routes provide for a completely separate right-of-way for the use of NEVs. (2) Class II NEV routes provide for a separate striped lane adjacent to roadways with speed limits of 55 miles per hour or less. (3) Class III NEV routes provide for shared use by NEVs with conventional vehicle traffic on streets with a speed limit of 35 miles per hour or less. SEC. 2. Section 1965.6 of the Streets and Highways Code is amended to read: 1965.6. (a) If the County of Orange adopts a NEV transportation plan for the Ranch Plan Planned Community pursuant to this chapter, the county shall submit a report to the Legislature on or before November 1, 2020, in consultation with the Department of Transportation, the Department of the California Highway Patrol, and local law enforcement agencies. (b) The report shall include all of the following: (1) A description of the NEV transportation plan and its elements that have been authorized up to that time. (2) An evaluation of the effectiveness of the NEV transportation plan, including its impact on traffic flows and safety. (3) A recommendation as to whether this chapter should be terminated, continued in existence and applicable solely to the Ranch Plan Planned Community, or expanded statewide. SEC. 3. Section 1965.7 of the Streets and Highways Code is amended to read: 1965.7. This chapter shall remain in effect only until January 1, 2022, and as of that date is repealed, unless a later enacted statute, that is enacted before January 1, 2022, deletes or extends that date. SEC. 4. No reimbursement is required by this act pursuant to Section 6 of Article XIII B of the California Constitution because the only costs that may be incurred by a local agency or school district will be incurred because this act creates a new crime or infraction, eliminates a crime or infraction, or changes the penalty for a crime or infraction, within the meaning of Section 17556 of the Government Code, or changes the definition of a crime within the meaning of Section 6 of Article XIII B of the California Constitution.