|
04/25/2016
|
Last day to consider Governors veto pursuant to Joint Rule 58.5.
|
|
|
|
10/09/2015
|
In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
|
|
|
|
10/09/2015
|
Vetoed by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/17/2015
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:45 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/11/2015
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 38. Noes 1. Page 2770.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/11/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 73. Noes 2. Page 3125.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/11/2015
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/10/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/09/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/08/2015
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (September 8).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/04/2015
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/02/2015
|
In Assembly. Held at Desk. Action rescinded whereby the bill was read a third time, passed, and ordered to the Senate. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/02/2015
|
Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/01/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 75. Noes 2. Page 2726.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/28/2015
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 27). Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/19/2015
|
August 19 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/16/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/15/2015
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (July 14).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/01/2015
|
July 7 hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/30/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (June 29). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/15/2015
|
Referred to Coms. on TRANS. and JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/02/2015
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 3. Page 1198.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1150.) (May 28). Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2015
|
Set for hearing May 28.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2015
|
May 18 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2015
|
Set for hearing May 18.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2015
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 728.) (April 21).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2015
|
Set for hearing April 21.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 526.) (April 7). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2015
|
Set for hearing April 7.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/26/2015
|
Referred to Coms. on T. & H. and JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2015
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 21.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2015
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|