California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB249 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 18, 2015

Enrolled

Bill September 16, 2015

Amended

Bill September 9, 2015
Bill September 4, 2015
Bill August 28, 2015
Bill July 16, 2015
Bill April 30, 2015