|
11/30/2016
|
Last day to consider Governor's veto pursuant to Joint Rule 58.5.
|
|
|
|
09/29/2016
|
In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
|
|
|
|
09/29/2016
|
Vetoed by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2016
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/24/2016
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 34. Noes 5. Page 5323.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/19/2016
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/18/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 5885.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/04/2016
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/02/2016
|
From inactive file. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/01/2016
|
Notice of intention to remove from inactive file given by Assembly Member Calderon.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/02/2015
|
Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Holden.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/01/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/31/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/28/2015
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (August 27).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/19/2015
|
August 19 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/15/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/08/2015
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HUM. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/01/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HUM. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/30/2015
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on HUM. S. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 30).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/15/2015
|
Referred to Coms. on JUD. and HUM. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/04/2015
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 1295.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2015
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1150.) (May 28).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2015
|
Set for hearing May 28.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2015
|
May 18 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2015
|
Set for hearing May 18.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2015
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 818.) (April 28).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2015
|
Set for hearing April 28.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2015
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 726.) (April 21). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2015
|
Set for hearing April 21.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2015
|
April 14 hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2015
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2015
|
Set for hearing April 14.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/26/2015
|
Referred to Coms. on HUMAN S. and JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2015
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 21.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2015
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|