LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB253
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB253
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB253
Compare Versions
SB253 Enrolled August 26, 2016
SB253 Amended August 4, 2016
SB253 Amended August 31, 2015
SB253 Amended July 8, 2015
SB253 Amended July 1, 2015
SB253 Amended June 2, 2015
SB253 Amended May 5, 2015
SB253 Amended April 22, 2015
SB253 Amended March 23, 2015
SB253 Introduced February 18, 2015
Version 1 (Old)
SB253 Enrolled August 26, 2016
SB253 Amended August 4, 2016
SB253 Amended August 31, 2015
SB253 Amended July 8, 2015
SB253 Amended July 1, 2015
SB253 Amended June 2, 2015
SB253 Amended May 5, 2015
SB253 Amended April 22, 2015
SB253 Amended March 23, 2015
SB253 Introduced February 18, 2015
Version 2 (New)
Compare