|
10/07/2015
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 574, Statutes of 2015.
|
|
|
|
10/07/2015
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/03/2015
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5:45 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/01/2015
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2367.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/31/2015
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/31/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 77. Noes 1. Page 2691.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/27/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/26/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 26).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/19/2015
|
August 19 hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/17/2015
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/01/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (July 1). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/25/2015
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on A. & A.R.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/28/2015
|
Referred to Com. on A. & A.R.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/18/2015
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 1029.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 973.) (May 12).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2015
|
Set for hearing May 12.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/26/2015
|
Referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2015
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 21.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2015
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|