California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB255 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 18, 2015

Enrolled

Bill September 2, 2015

Chaptered

Bill October 7, 2015

Amended

Bill August 17, 2015
Bill June 25, 2015