Assembly
|
11/30/2016
|
From Assembly without further action.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
11/30/2016
|
From committee without further action.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/24/2016
|
August 24 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/22/2016
|
Joint Rule 62(a) suspended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/19/2016
|
Read third time and amended. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 5952.) Ordered to third reading. Re-referred to Com. on B. & P. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/11/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/10/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 14. Noes 5.) (August 10).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/04/2016
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/03/2016
|
August 3 hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/30/2016
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/29/2016
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 3.) (June 28).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/22/2016
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/21/2016
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 9. Noes 6.) (June 21).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/14/2016
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B. & P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/07/2015
|
July 7 hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/30/2015
|
June 30 set for second hearing. Failed passage in committee. Reconsideration granted.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/17/2015
|
June 23 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/11/2015
|
Referred to Coms. on B. & P. and JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/22/2015
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 29. Noes 9. Page 1070.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1033.) (May 18).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2015
|
Set for hearing May 18.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2015
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1. Page 818.) (April 28).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2015
|
Set for hearing April 28.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on RLS. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 699.) (April 20). Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2015
|
Set for hearing April 20.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2015
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2015
|
April 13 hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2015
|
Set for hearing April 13.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2015
|
Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2015
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2015
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|