California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB270 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 19, 2015

Amended

Bill August 19, 2016
Bill August 4, 2016
Bill June 30, 2016
Bill June 22, 2016
Bill June 14, 2016
Bill June 23, 2015
Bill May 5, 2015
Bill April 14, 2015
Bill April 6, 2015