Senate
|
05/12/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2015
|
Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2015
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2015
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1. Page 818.) (April 28).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2015
|
Set for hearing April 28.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2015
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 7. Noes 2. Page 721.) (April 22). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2015
|
Set for hearing April 22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2015
|
April 15 set for first hearing. Testimony taken. Further hearing to be set.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2015
|
Set for hearing April 15.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2015
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on ED. (Ayes 6. Noes 2. Page 544.) (April 8). Re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2015
|
Set for hearing April 8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2015
|
Referred to Coms. on HEALTH, ED., and JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2015
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2015
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. (Corrected February 20).
|
|
|