California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB277 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 19, 2015

Enrolled

Bill June 29, 2015

Chaptered

Bill June 30, 2015

Amended

Bill June 18, 2015
Bill June 11, 2015
Bill May 7, 2015
Bill May 5, 2015
Bill April 22, 2015
Bill April 9, 2015