Senate | 02/01/2016 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | ||
Senate | 04/20/2015 | April 27 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Senate | 04/17/2015 | Set for hearing April 27. | ||
Senate | 04/15/2015 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on P.E. & R. | ||
Senate | 04/06/2015 | April 13 hearing postponed by committee. | ||
Senate | 03/25/2015 | Set for hearing April 13. | ||
Senate | 03/05/2015 | Referred to Com. on P.E. & R. | ||
Senate | 02/20/2015 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 22. | ||
Senate | 02/19/2015 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |