California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB284 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 19, 2015

Enrolled

Bill July 27, 2015

Chaptered

Bill August 10, 2015

Amended

Bill May 5, 2015
Bill April 22, 2015