LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB284
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB284
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB284
Compare Versions
SB284 Chaptered August 10, 2015
SB284 Enrolled July 27, 2015
SB284 Amended May 5, 2015
SB284 Amended April 22, 2015
SB284 Introduced February 19, 2015
Version 1 (Old)
SB284 Chaptered August 10, 2015
SB284 Enrolled July 27, 2015
SB284 Amended May 5, 2015
SB284 Amended April 22, 2015
SB284 Introduced February 19, 2015
Version 2 (New)
Compare