|
09/02/2015
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 245, Statutes of 2015.
|
|
|
|
09/02/2015
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/26/2015
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/20/2015
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 38. Noes 0.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/19/2015
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/16/2015
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/16/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 2432.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/09/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/08/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (July 8).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/23/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (June 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/04/2015
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B. & F.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/04/2015
|
Referred to Com. on B. & F.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/22/2015
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1065.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2015
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2015
|
Set for hearing May 18.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2015
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 819.) (April 28).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2015
|
Set for hearing April 28.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 617.) (April 15). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2015
|
Set for hearing April 15.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2015
|
Referred to Coms. on B. & F.I. and JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2015
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2015
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|