LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB285
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB285
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB285
Compare Versions
SB285 Chaptered September 2, 2015
SB285 Enrolled August 24, 2015
SB285 Amended June 4, 2015
SB285 Amended May 5, 2015
SB285 Introduced February 19, 2015
Version 1 (Old)
SB285 Chaptered September 2, 2015
SB285 Enrolled August 24, 2015
SB285 Amended June 4, 2015
SB285 Amended May 5, 2015
SB285 Introduced February 19, 2015
Version 2 (New)
Compare