California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB286 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 19, 2015

Amended

Bill March 1, 2016
Bill August 18, 2015
Bill June 2, 2015
Bill April 29, 2015
Bill April 27, 2015
Bill April 14, 2015