LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB286
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB286
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB286
Compare Versions
SB286 Amended March 1, 2016
SB286 Amended August 18, 2015
SB286 Amended June 2, 2015
SB286 Amended April 29, 2015
SB286 Amended April 27, 2015
SB286 Amended April 14, 2015
SB286 Introduced February 19, 2015
Version 1 (Old)
SB286 Amended March 1, 2016
SB286 Amended August 18, 2015
SB286 Amended June 2, 2015
SB286 Amended April 29, 2015
SB286 Amended April 27, 2015
SB286 Amended April 14, 2015
SB286 Introduced February 19, 2015
Version 2 (New)
Compare