|
09/27/2016
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 707, Statutes of 2016.
|
|
|
|
09/27/2016
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/24/2016
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/18/2016
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 5140.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/16/2016
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/11/2016
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/11/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 5777.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/04/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/03/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 20. Noes 0.) (August 3).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/01/2016
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/29/2016
|
June 29 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/22/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/28/2016
|
Referred to Com. on P.E., R., & S.S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/26/2016
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 2943.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/20/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/19/2016
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/16/2016
|
Set for hearing January 19.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/15/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 3. Noes 0. Page 2908.) (January 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/08/2016
|
Set for hearing January 14.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/06/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on P.E. & R.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/04/2016
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. (Corrected January 6)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2015
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2015
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 26.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2015
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|