California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB294 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 23, 2015

Enrolled

Bill August 19, 2016

Chaptered

Bill September 27, 2016

Amended

Bill August 1, 2016
Bill January 4, 2016