|
04/04/2016
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 4, Statutes of 2016.
|
|
|
|
04/04/2016
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2016
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2016
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 26. Noes 12. Page 3356.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2016
|
From committee: That the Assembly amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 4. Noes 1. Page 3361.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2016
|
From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on L. & I.R. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d). (Ayes 3. Noes 1. Page 3354.) Re-referred to Com. on L. & I.R.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2016
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/31/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 48. Noes 26. Page 4122.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/31/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading. Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Ayes 50. Noes 23. Page 4120.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/30/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 7.) (March 30).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/28/2016
|
Joint Rule 62(a) suspended. From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Corrected March 29).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/27/2015
|
August 27 hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/19/2015
|
August 19 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/09/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (July 8). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/15/2015
|
Referred to Com. on L. & E.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/02/2015
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 23. Noes 15. Page 1212.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 1145.) (May 28). Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2015
|
Set for hearing May 28.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2015
|
April 20 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2015
|
Set for hearing April 20.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1. Page 1702.) (April 8). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2015
|
Set for hearing April 8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2015
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on L. & I.R.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/15/2015
|
Referred to Com. on L. & I.R.
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/02/2014
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after January 1.
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/01/2014
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|