California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB3 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 1, 2014

Enrolled

Bill March 31, 2016

Chaptered

Bill April 4, 2016

Amended

Bill March 28, 2016
Bill March 11, 2015