|
10/01/2015
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 417, Statutes of 2015.
|
|
|
|
10/01/2015
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/11/2015
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 10:45 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/10/2015
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2663.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/08/2015
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/08/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 2965.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/04/2015
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/03/2015
|
From inactive file. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/02/2015
|
Notice of intention to remove from inactive file given by Assembly Member Holden.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/27/2015
|
Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Cristina Garcia.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/20/2015
|
From consent calendar on motion of Assembly Member Waldron. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/17/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/16/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/15/2015
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (July 15).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/08/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (July 7). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/02/2015
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on P. & C.P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/23/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on P. & C.P. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (June 22). Re-referred to Com. on P. & C.P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/11/2015
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B. & F.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/04/2015
|
Referred to Coms. on B. & F. and P. & C.P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/22/2015
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1065.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2015
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2015
|
Set for hearing May 18.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2015
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2015
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 728.) (April 21).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2015
|
Set for hearing April 21.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 617.) (April 15). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2015
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B. & F.I.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2015
|
Set for hearing April 15.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2015
|
Referred to Coms. on B. & F.I. and JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2015
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 26.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2015
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|