LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB300
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB300
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB300
Compare Versions
SB300 Chaptered October 1, 2015
SB300 Enrolled September 10, 2015
SB300 Amended September 4, 2015
SB300 Amended July 16, 2015
SB300 Amended July 2, 2015
SB300 Amended June 11, 2015
SB300 Amended May 5, 2015
SB300 Amended April 30, 2015
SB300 Amended March 26, 2015
SB300 Introduced February 23, 2015
Version 1 (Old)
SB300 Chaptered October 1, 2015
SB300 Enrolled September 10, 2015
SB300 Amended September 4, 2015
SB300 Amended July 16, 2015
SB300 Amended July 2, 2015
SB300 Amended June 11, 2015
SB300 Amended May 5, 2015
SB300 Amended April 30, 2015
SB300 Amended March 26, 2015
SB300 Introduced February 23, 2015
Version 2 (New)
Compare