California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB302 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 23, 2015

Enrolled

Bill June 2, 2015

Chaptered

Bill June 5, 2015

Amended

Bill May 7, 2015
Bill April 20, 2015