BILL NUMBER: SB 302CHAPTERED BILL TEXT CHAPTER 5 FILED WITH SECRETARY OF STATE JUNE 5, 2015 APPROVED BY GOVERNOR JUNE 5, 2015 PASSED THE SENATE MAY 11, 2015 PASSED THE ASSEMBLY JUNE 1, 2015 AMENDED IN SENATE MAY 7, 2015 AMENDED IN SENATE APRIL 20, 2015 INTRODUCED BY Senator Lara FEBRUARY 23, 2015 An act relating to the payment of claims against the state, making an appropriation therefor, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST SB 302, Lara. Claims against the state: appropriation. Existing law requires the Attorney General to pay certain judgments against the state. This bill would appropriate $141,250 from the Athletic Commission Fund and $24,106,173.50 from the General Fund to pay specified judgments. This bill would declare that it is to take effect immediately as an urgency statute. Appropriation: yes. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. (a) One hundred forty-one thousand two hundred fifty dollars ($141,250) is hereby appropriated from the Athletic Commission Fund to be allocated in accordance with the following schedule: (1) Seventy-one thousand two hundred fifty dollars ($71,250) to the Department of Consumer Affairs to pay the settlement in Sarah Waklee v. California State Athletic Commission, Department of Consumer Affairs (Sacramento County Superior Court, Case No. 2012-00135227). Any funds appropriated in excess of the amounts required for payment of this claim shall revert to the Athletic Commission Fund. (2) Seventy thousand dollars ($70,000) to the Department of Consumer Affairs to pay the settlement in Dwayne Woodard v. California State Athletic Commission, Department of Consumer Affairs (Los Angeles County Superior Court, Case No. BC487180). Any funds appropriated in excess of the amounts required for the payment of this claim shall revert to the Athletic Commission Fund. (b) Twenty-four million one hundred six thousand one hundred seventy-three dollars and fifty cents ($24,106,173.50) is hereby appropriated from the General Fund to be allocated in accordance with the following schedule: (1) The sum of twenty-four million dollars ($24,000,000) to the Department of General Services to pay the settlement in California First, LP v. California Department of General Services, et al. (San Francisco County Superior Court, Case No. CGC10-505436). Any funds appropriated in excess of the amount required for the payment of this claim shall revert to the General Fund. (2) The sum of one hundred six thousand one hundred seventy-three dollars and fifty cents ($106,173.50) to the Fair Political Practices Commission to pay the settlement in Charles R. "Chuck" Reed, et al. v. Fair Political Practices Commission (Sacramento County Superior Court, Case No. 34-2013-80001709). Any funds appropriated in excess of the amounts required for the payment of this claim shall revert to the General Fund. SEC. 2. This act is an urgency statute necessary for the immediate preservation of the public peace, health, or safety within the meaning of Article IV of the Constitution and shall go into immediate effect. The facts constituting the necessity are: In order to pay judgment and settlement claims against the state and end hardship to claimants as quickly as possible, it is necessary for this act to take effect immediately.