Assembly
|
11/30/2016
|
From Assembly without further action.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
11/30/2016
|
Died on unfinished business, reconsideration pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2016
|
Read third time. Refused passage. (Ayes 31. Noes 34. Page 6492.) Motion to reconsider made by Assembly Member O'Donnell.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/24/2016
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/17/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/16/2016
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/15/2016
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 14. Noes 6.) (August 11).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/29/2016
|
June 29 set for second hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/19/2015
|
August 19 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/16/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (July 15). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/16/2015
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/08/2015
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/01/2015
|
July 1 hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/15/2015
|
Referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/02/2015
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 24. Noes 15. Page 1260.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2015
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 1151.) (May 28).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2015
|
Set for hearing May 28.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2015
|
May 18 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2015
|
Set for hearing May 18.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2015
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 2. Page 722.) (April 22).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2015
|
Set for hearing April 22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2015
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 26.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2015
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|