California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB322 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 23, 2015

Amended

Bill August 24, 2016
Bill August 16, 2016
Bill July 16, 2015
Bill July 8, 2015
Bill June 1, 2015
Bill May 13, 2015
Bill April 29, 2015
Bill April 13, 2015