Assembly
|
11/30/2016
|
From Assembly without further action.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
11/30/2016
|
Returned to Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/28/2016
|
June 28 set for final hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/14/2015
|
July 14 hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/13/2015
|
Joint Rule 62(a) suspended. (Page 2358.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/09/2015
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B. & P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/07/2015
|
July 7 set for second hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/30/2015
|
June 30 set for first hearing. Failed passage in committee. Reconsideration granted.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/22/2015
|
Referred to Com. on B. & P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/07/2015
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 25. Noes 5. Page 931.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 884.) (May 4).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2015
|
Set for hearing May 4.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2015
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 699.) (April 20).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2015
|
Set for hearing April 20.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2015
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2015
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2015
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 26.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2015
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|