LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB323
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB323
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB323
Compare Versions
SB323 Amended July 9, 2015
SB323 Amended July 7, 2015
SB323 Amended June 23, 2015
SB323 Amended April 22, 2015
SB323 Amended March 26, 2015
SB323 Introduced February 23, 2015
Version 1 (Old)
SB323 Amended July 9, 2015
SB323 Amended July 7, 2015
SB323 Amended June 23, 2015
SB323 Amended April 22, 2015
SB323 Amended March 26, 2015
SB323 Introduced February 23, 2015
Version 2 (New)
Compare