California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB328 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 23, 2015

Enrolled

Bill August 25, 2015

Chaptered

Bill September 8, 2015

Amended

Bill August 17, 2015
Bill May 4, 2015