LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB328
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB328
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB328
Compare Versions
SB328 Chaptered September 8, 2015
SB328 Enrolled August 25, 2015
SB328 Amended August 17, 2015
SB328 Amended May 4, 2015
SB328 Introduced February 23, 2015
Version 1 (Old)
SB328 Chaptered September 8, 2015
SB328 Enrolled August 25, 2015
SB328 Amended August 17, 2015
SB328 Amended May 4, 2015
SB328 Introduced February 23, 2015
Version 2 (New)
Compare