California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB33 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 1, 2014

Amended

Bill August 28, 2015
Bill June 1, 2015
Bill April 6, 2015
Bill March 17, 2015
Bill March 11, 2015