LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB33
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB33
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB33
Compare Versions
SB33 Amended August 28, 2015
SB33 Amended June 1, 2015
SB33 Amended April 6, 2015
SB33 Amended March 17, 2015
SB33 Amended March 11, 2015
SB33 Introduced December 1, 2014
Version 1 (Old)
SB33 Amended August 28, 2015
SB33 Amended June 1, 2015
SB33 Amended April 6, 2015
SB33 Amended March 17, 2015
SB33 Amended March 11, 2015
SB33 Introduced December 1, 2014
Version 2 (New)
Compare