|
10/09/2015
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 714, Statutes of 2015.
|
|
|
|
10/09/2015
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/11/2015
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 10:45 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/10/2015
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 22. Noes 15. Page 2673.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/08/2015
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/08/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 48. Noes 29. Page 2969.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/31/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/28/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (August 27).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/19/2015
|
August 19 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/17/2015
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/15/2015
|
July 15 hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/02/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 4.) (July 1). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/23/2015
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/11/2015
|
Referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/22/2015
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 25. Noes 14. Page 1066.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2015
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2015
|
Set for hearing May 18.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1. Page 815.) (April 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2015
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2015
|
Set for hearing April 29.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2015
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2015
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2015
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 26.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2015
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|