California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB331 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 23, 2015

Enrolled

Bill September 10, 2015

Chaptered

Bill October 9, 2015

Amended

Bill August 17, 2015
Bill July 13, 2015
Bill June 23, 2015
Bill April 22, 2015
Bill April 6, 2015